Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Indenture Trustee, For The Holders Of The Cim Trust 2017-7, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2017-7, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nardolillo, Michael William, Thibaut, Juliana, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, against Amy L. Sherman Aka Amy L. Wooden, Christopher S. Wooden Aka Christophe Wooden, John Doe And Jane Doe, Sterling Jewelers Inc. Dba Kay Outlet, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 23, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
July 06, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
July 06, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
June 09, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
June 09, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing, Notice of Entry | ||
June 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
April 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR Assignments of Mortgage Redacted |
||
April 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Oath & Report |
||
April 29, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.