Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Schachter, Howard, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Katrina A Morabito A K A Katrina Morabito, represented by Anderson, Adrianna, Kohli, Amelia Rose, Mccloud, Lakeshia Shante, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 14, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
March 14, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
January 04, 2023 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING | ||
November 23, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Carol B Winslow, Chief Clerk |
||
November 15, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 15, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | ||
November 15, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
March 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2021 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.