Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
James Emmons, Jane Emmons, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Halpin, Robert L., against Murray R Wheeler, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Barry L Porsch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L Porsch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Sch Referee's Report Schedule A |
||
March 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Referee's Report Exhibit B |
||
March 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Referee's Report Exhibit A |
||
March 24, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
November 28, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
November 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
November 07, 2022 |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #3) Corrected Plaintiff's Bill of Costs |
||
September 26, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Affidavit of Regularity Exhibit B |
||
September 23, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE (Motion #2) Filing on Behalf of - Carol B Winslow, Chief Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.