Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Crystal L Dean, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 26, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
October 03, 2023 |
EXECUTION RETURNED INCOME EXECUTION - FULLY SATISFIED |
||
April 30, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 30, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
April 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1372239 | ||
April 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1372239 |
||
April 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1372239 |
||
April 29, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1372239 |
||
January 26, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.