Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Schuyler Hospital Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammond, Chad Richard, against Tracey Darcy, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: March 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 |
EXECUTION Returned Income Execution - Wholly Unsatisfied |
||
April 28, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Returned Income Execution - Wholly Unsatisfied |
||
March 15, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AND ENTRY THEREOF |
||
March 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
March 12, 2021 | Judgment with Bill of Costs | ||
March 12, 2021 |
BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted |
||
March 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 09, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted |
||
December 07, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.