Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Esl Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Connors, Mary Mcauley, against Lyle Labarr, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Service Invoice |
||
January 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contract Redacted |
||
January 28, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Non-Military Affirmation and Search |
||
November 13, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 Affidavit of Mailing |
||
November 06, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 06, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LYLE LABARR - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
October 13, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.