Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
United Auto Credit Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Capriotti, David M, Connors, Mary Mcauley, against Denise Egburtson, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 27, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 contract |
||
November 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 service invoice |
||
November 13, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 nonmilitary affirmation and search |
||
March 02, 2020 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
December 16, 2019 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING |
||
December 16, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DENISE EGBURTSON - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
November 27, 2019 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.