Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Ashley Arcangeli, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Cycle Time199 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 16, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 16, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 16, 2020 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
November 25, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
November 25, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 25, 2019 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 25, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
November 25, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
November 25, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
October 09, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.