Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reliant Community Federal Credit Union F K A Wcta Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Tammy G Walker, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts Yates County Supreme Court with Jason L Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason L Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions196 days |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseYates County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time197 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2020RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - AWARDING FEE Exparte |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of mailing |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Filed Affidavit of Service |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military Status |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.