Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Deery, Elizabeth Emily, Sarkis, Andreana Maria, Verhagen, Jason P, Wallace, Stephanie Marie, against Marie Wright, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts Yates County Supreme Court with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions109 days |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseYates County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: August 02, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2019ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1)
Date: October 02, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: September 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 17, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 20, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 15, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) INVOICE |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) NOTICE OF ENTRY/ORDER/AFF OF MAILING |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) JUDGMENT |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1) | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.