Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Finger Lakes Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Stacey Ingerick, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts Yates County Supreme Court with Jason L Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason L Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions142 days |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseYates County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time156 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2019ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: October 02, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)
Date: September 24, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: September 24, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 10, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - EXPARTE Order Awarding Attorney Fees and Authorizing Entry of Judgment |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1) | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.