Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The Canandaigua National Bank And Trust Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Palmer, Devin Lawton, against Britney S. Turney, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts Yates County Supreme Court with Jason L Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason L Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions381 days |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseYates County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time391 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: February 11, 2020SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 05, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: March 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) NON Military |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.