Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Kocher, Hon. William F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKocher, Hon. William F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time188 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2017 | Hearing |
Dismissed Kocher (Court Activity) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
April 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
April 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
April 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #003) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
January 06, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 04/21/2017Decided Before Justice: Kocher, Hon. William F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.