Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Om-Other case in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Bender, Hon. Dennis F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBender, Hon. Dennis F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2016 |
CategoryOm-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
June 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Dismissed Bender (Court Activity) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
June 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Bender (Hearing) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
May 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Bender (Hearing) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
May 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
April 18, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Bender (Motion Part) Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
|
April 18, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 06/13/2016Decided Before Justice: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bender, Hon. Dennis F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.