Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Cook, Hon. Jason L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCook, Hon. Jason L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2018 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Cook (Hearing)
Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
February 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
February 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
February 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
January 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Reassignment Kocher (Court Activity) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
December 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
December 16, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 02/20/2019Decided Before Justice: Cook, Hon. Jason L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
November 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
November 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Case Not Settled Kocher (Settlement Conference) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.