Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Kocher, Hon. William F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKocher, Hon. William F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2018 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time207 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
December 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
December 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
December 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Discontinued Kocher (Court Activity) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
November 19, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 12/11/2018Decided Before Justice: Kocher, Hon. William F. Answer demanded: No Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
November 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Kocher (Motion Part) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
November 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
November 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled - Loan Modification Kocher (Settlement Conference) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
November 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
July 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Kocher (Hearing) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.