Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Kocher, Hon. William F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKocher, Hon. William F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2018 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time459 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
October 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided Cook (Court Activity) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
October 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
October 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
September 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Cook (Hearing) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
July 26, 2019 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 10/02/2019Decided Before Justice: Cook, Hon. Jason L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
July 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Cook (Motion Part) Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
|
May 21, 2019 | Hearing |
Reassignment Kocher (Court Activity) Judge: Kocher, Hon. William F. |
|
May 21, 2019 | Hearing |
Cook (Court Activity)
Judge: Cook, Hon. Jason L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.