Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Allianz Global Risks Us Insurance Company And Energy Insurance Mutual As Subrogees Of New York State Electric & Gas Corporation, And New York State Electric & Gas Corporation, Allianz Global Risks Us Insurance Company And Energy Insurance Mutual As Subrogees Of New York State Electric & Gas Corporation, And New York State Electric & Gas Corporation, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Hardy, Tyler David, Stern, Robert Ashley, against Fca Us Llc,, Fca Us Llc, Finger Lakes Communication Company Inc, Finger Lakes Communication Company, Inc., Goodrich Implement, Inc., Hyster-Yale Group Risk Management, Kubota Tractor Corporation, And Structural Metal Fabricators, Inc., Goodrich Implement Inc, (total of 8) See All represented by Alexander, Tiffany Marie, Dipalma, Jeffrey Peter, Freedenberg, John P., Freeman, Timothy Robert Ross, Hoffman, Elizabeth Anne, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts with Terrence M. Parker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerrence M. Parker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2.5)
Date: September 24, 2021ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
October 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
October 05, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #8) Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment - Defendant Hyster-Yale Group, Inc. |
||
October 05, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
June 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
June 10, 2022 |
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel |
||
June 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #8) Affidavit of Jason Wallace |
||
June 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - OPQ (Motion #8) Photos |
||
June 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #8) Email dated 11-16-2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.