Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cab East Llc, Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, Htd Leasing Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Brad Hall, Carey Hewitt, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts with Michael M Mohun presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael M Mohun Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | ORDER - SEIZURE | ||
August 31, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 30, 2021 | ORDER - SEIZURE | ||
July 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) PROPOSED ORDER OF SEIZURE |
||
July 27, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
July 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) CONTRACT |
||
July 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) DMV SEARCH |
||
July 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) TITLE |
||
July 27, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) BOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.