Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Richard T. Morgan, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Foote, Theron Abbey, against Emilie M. Hauri, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Monies Owed) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 24, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: July 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Judgment by Default |
||
August 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Judgment by Default |
||
July 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 28, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* Proposed Default Judgment |
||
June 22, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT CPLR 3215 Affidavit of Service - Emilie M. Hauri |
||
May 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* Affidavit of Service - Emilie M. Hauri |
||
May 24, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.