Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Peter Akin, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 04, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
September 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
September 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
September 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
April 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.