Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Gunther, Tess E, Verhagen, Jason P, against Gloria J Kaufman, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts with Michael M Mohun presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael M Mohun Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 01, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 04, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
April 13, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
April 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 25, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF TESS E. GUNTHER, ESQ. | ||
May 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
May 25, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 25, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
May 07, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
May 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.