Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Robert Douglass, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2022 |
EXECUTION UNSATISFIED INCOME EXECUTION |
||
September 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 21, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
September 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION Redacted |
||
September 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
September 21, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
September 21, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
June 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 05, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 23, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT FZOD570782 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.