Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Elitsac, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Roach, David Martin, against Robert W Piechocki Jr, R&R Precision Construction Inc, in the jurisdiction of Wyoming County, NY, . Wyoming County, NY Superior Courts with Michael M Mohun presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael M Mohun Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWyoming County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
July 18, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Email from Plaintiff Attorney advising matter settled. |
||
July 13, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - MOTION | ||
July 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
||
July 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C EX FOR ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT |
||
July 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D EX FOR ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT |
||
July 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E EX FOR ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT |
||
July 01, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
July 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EX FOR ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.