Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gloria Oliveras, Lee Porazzo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zack, Leonard, against Gloria Wilburn, Houlihan Lawrence, Inc., Oliver Yourke, represented by Briem, Jeffrey, Calabro, Colleen J., Giacoia, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Lawrence Ecker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLawrence Ecker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management127 days |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Breach Of Contract) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time464 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 23, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: December 10, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 23, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 19, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: March 04, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: September 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: September 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: March 22, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 17, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) *Corrected*
Date: December 11, 2019ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #3)
Date: December 02, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: May 17, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: September 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: October 14, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: March 22, 2019ORDER - TRIAL READINESS
Date: August 02, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #4)
Date: March 02, 2020ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: June 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #4) | |
February 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #004)
Judge: Ecker, Hon. Lawrence H. |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) *Corrected* | |
December 11, 2019 | Motion |
Renew/Reargue/Resettle/Reconsider (Motion #004) Decided: 02/19/2020Withdrawn Before Justice: Ecker, Hon. Lawrence H. Answer demanded: No Judge: Ecker, Hon. Lawrence H. |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4) | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #3) | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Copy of Decision/Order Motion Seq, No. 3 |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.