Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Electric Fixx Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Chan, Henry, Wilson, Jeffrey Lance, against Macquesten Construction Management, Llc, Macquesten Takeover Partners Llc, Rella Fogliano, represented by Hochberg, Shari B., Nicolay, Harry Joseph, Venditti, Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Gretchen Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGretchen Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 11, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 11, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 23, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
TRC/TEAMS
Judge: Walsh, Hon. Gretchen |
|
November 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned TRC/SKYPE Judge: Walsh, Hon. Gretchen |
|
October 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Held 9:15 FOLLOW UP CALL/DISCOVERY IS COMPLETED/TEAMS Judge: Walsh, Hon. Gretchen |
|
October 09, 2020 | Hearing |
Held VIA SKYPE Judge: Walsh, Hon. Gretchen |
|
August 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned TRC/SKYPE Judge: Walsh, Hon. Gretchen |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Verified Answer with counterclaim |
|
July 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Held 2PM-PRE-MOTION CONF/SKYPE Judge: Walsh, Hon. Gretchen |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Amended Preliminary Conference Order |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified answer with Counterclaims |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Amended Proposed PC order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.