Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York, As Trustee For The Certificateholders Of Cwalt, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-19, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-19, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Levine, Eric M, against Antonio Greco, John Greco, Juan Leyua, Maria Leyua, Rafael Leyua, (total of 7) See All represented by Aufrecht, Mary Kathryn, Clair, Ira S, Rosellini, Kenneth James, Spizzirro, Louis M, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with William J Giacomo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam J Giacomo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2013 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1650 days |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time1650 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 25, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 02, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 02, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 23, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 11, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 11, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 07, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 11, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: April 30, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 16, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 10, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 13, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 13, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 27, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 16, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 15, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 24, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 24, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 04, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 24, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: July 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 20, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 22, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 16, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 05, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 12, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 24, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 14, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 23, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 12, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 11, 2013REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 15, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 24, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Held Virtual Conference Held Judge: Giacomo, Hon. William J. |
|
October 14, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
October 13, 2020 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
October 05, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #006) No appearance required Submission only Judge: Giacomo, Hon. William J. |
|
August 12, 2020 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.