Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jeanne Delillo, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Pashkin, Mitchell L, against David A Cohen, Harry Stylianou, Mitchell G Slamowitz, Mitchell Selip, Richard S Eichenbaum, (total of 6) See All represented by Bursky-Stillman, Alicia S., Slamowitz, Mitchell G, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with William J Giacomo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam J Giacomo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2015 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions833 days |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time829 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 03, 2017ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: April 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL Dismissal Order Dated 12/19/17 |
|
December 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Dismissed Preliminary Conference Part FCP for dismissal 10/30, 11/28, 12/11 No app |
|
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Preliminary Conference Part FCP for dismissal 10/30, 11/28, 12/11 No app |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
November 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Preliminary Conference Part |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
October 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Preliminary Conference Part |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Seq. 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.