Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Akil Forest, Anna Masopust, Anthony Davis As Father And Natural Guardian Of A.D.,, Anthony Davis Individually, Antoinette Silver -Individually And As Mother & Natural Guardian Of A G An Infant, (total of 94) See All filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Hall, Christina Tanya, Podolsky, Erica, Ronemus, Michael B, against H & S Property Managment, Inc, Independent Support Services, Inc., Miama James, Premier Home Healthcare Services, Inc.,, Seven Pines Associates Limited Partnership, (total of 5) See All represented by Finger, Carl L, Kirrane, William Kenneth, Maxwell, Joel Michael, Panoyan, Susan Esther, Peart, Haylei, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Damaris Torrent presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDamaris Torrent Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. The plaintiffs in this case include Shamar Anderson, Perpetual Appia, Melissa Akal, Ruthlyn Belnavis, Lieutenant Bollin, Donald Britton, Krystle Thompson, ...
BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 10, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2023ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: March 20, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: January 03, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 18, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 17, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 19, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 02, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 19, 2022STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 02, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 07, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 17, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 18, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 27, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 10, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 15, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 10, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 10, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 09, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 13, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 13, 2024ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 17, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: February 21, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 14, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 05, 2023ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 04, 2023ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: August 18, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 11, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 28, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 06, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 07, 2023ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: August 18, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 16, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 04, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 07, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 02, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 13, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 10, 2023STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service by regular mail and e-mail |
||
April 10, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #3) | ||
April 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) email correspodence |
||
April 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) email correspondence |
||
April 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) email correspondence |
||
April 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Funeral Bill |
||
April 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) email correspondence |
||
April 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) email correspondence |
||
April 09, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #3) | ||
April 09, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.