Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Victoria Liverpool, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Savit, Joel B, Taub, Michael L, against Lori Liverpool, The Wendy'S Company, Wendy'S Restaurant Inc., Wendy'S Restaurants Of New York Llc, represented by Galluzzo, Dianne Marie, Gerbino, Vincent Frank, Glidden, Michael J, Shapiro, Nathan Michael, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Citarella, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCitarella, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management134 days |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time844 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 01, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Discontinued Settlement Conference Part |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Settlement Conference Part |
|
October 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Settlement Conference Part |
|
October 04, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Settlement Conference Part |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation of Adjournment to October 23, 2017 |
|
September 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Settlement Conference Part |
|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Decision and Order with Notice of Entry Mot Seq #001 w/AOS |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
May 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Orazio R. Bellantoni - Motions Judge: Bellantoni, Hon. Orazio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.