Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee For Lsf8 Master Participation Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Baisley, Zack Everett, against Citibank, Henrietta Pinckney, John And Jane Does, Nyree Belton A K A Nyree Dawn Belton A K A Nyree D. Belton, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Alan D. Scheinkman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan D. Scheinkman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time351 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 31, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 22, 2016ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
August 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Hon. Alan D. Scheinkman Judge: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. |
|
August 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled: Loan Modification - Represented Foreclosure Settlement Conference Part Judge: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. |
|
August 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Continued Foreclosure Settlement Conference Part Judge: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 22, 2016 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #001) Decided: 08/15/2016Granted Before Justice: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Scheinkman, Hon. Alan D. |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.