Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sanford Realty Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Wilkes, David, against Mount Vernon City, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Bruce E Tolbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce E Tolbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2015RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: June 18, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Discontinued
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
|
October 07, 2020 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
|
September 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
|
September 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
|
August 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
|
July 21, 2020 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
July 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
|
June 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
|
March 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled
Judge: Tolbert, Hon. Bruce E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.