Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Tra) case represented by Brousseau, Shawn Frederick, against A A R, Bhg Structured Settlements, Inc., First Berkshire Hathaway Life Insurance Co., represented by Drucker, Robert Michael, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Mary H Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary H Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Tra) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
|
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order with Notice of Entry |
||
February 02, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 10, 2021 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO OSC (AFTER SERVICE) (Motion #1) Itemization of renovation costs provided by payee |
||
December 07, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS affirmation and proposed order |
||
December 04, 2020 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO OSC (AFTER SERVICE) (Motion #1) New Disclosure with increased purchase price |
||
December 03, 2020 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Order |
||
December 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation |
||
November 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Order dated 8.19.20 |
||
November 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Order dated 5.6.20 |
||
November 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contract Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.