Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daniel Hy Jo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Shapiro, Alexander T, against H.P. Barnes, Inc., Theodore Barnes, represented by Galvin, Martin Conway, Stiefeld, Marc E, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Charles D Wood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles D Wood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management330 days |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 03, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 19, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 |
ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM (Motion #5) ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUE GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
||
September 21, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 20, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 13, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
May 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #5) Summation Memorandum |
||
April 23, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 15, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge re: noting counsel who will appear for guardianship conference |
||
February 18, 2021 | Hearing | Clerkin, Diane - Compliance Conference Part | |
January 29, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #005) CPO - FOR STATUS Judge: Wood, Hon. Charles David |
|
January 15, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Wood |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.