Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, Rothman, Keith H, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Barbara Palmer Greene, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Terry Jane Ruderman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry Jane Ruderman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2016 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Card) Transaction Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time344 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Terry Jane Ruderman - Motions Judge: PC Motion Part, |
|
June 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Terry Jane Ruderman - Motions Judge: PC Motion Part, |
|
June 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Terry Jane Ruderman - Motions Judge: PC Motion Part, |
|
May 18, 2016 | Motion |
Judgment - Default (Motion #001) Decided: 06/24/2016Granted Before Justice: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane Answer demanded: No Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.