Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jan Russo, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Jacobson, Jay D, against Sarah Lawrence College, represented by Manson, David B, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Janet C Malone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet C Malone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises - Sidewalk) |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 27, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: August 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
September 23, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 23, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
August 23, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 18, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
April 04, 2022 | Bill of Particulars | ||
March 31, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 24, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
March 14, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 14, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.