Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cleodell Milagro Lopez-Morales By The Guardian Of Her Person And Property, Agnes Morales, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lapp, Ira Harley, Neimark, Marshall Adam, against Jeffrey M. Leete, Opengate, Inc., Peppinos Food, Inc., Redora Diane Brown, represented by Campbell, Jay Sung, Gasparini, Louis U, Newsome, Michele Diane, Robbins, Caitriona Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with David F Everett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid F Everett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 08, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 09, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 28, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 29, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 06, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2021SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: April 06, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 06, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 28, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 06, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 18, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 29, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 08, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2021ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: December 30, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2022 |
ORDER - CONSOLIDATION CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH INDEX 50877/2018- PARTIES MUST RECORD CONSENT UNDER 50877/2018 |
||
December 15, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 14, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2) PLT'S LETTER APP FOR ADJMNT OF 12-21-22 ORAL ARGUMENT |
||
December 14, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2) STATEMENT OF AUTH TO E-FILE |
||
December 05, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 28, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel dated September 28, 2022 |
||
September 28, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND COVER LETTER OF EXCHANGE OF BP ETC. |
||
September 28, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Letter to Co-Defendants dated September 28, 2022 |
||
June 29, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #2) Counter Statement of Material Facts |
||
June 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Partial Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.