Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nicholas J. Loria, Robert L. Rossman, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Wilson, Kristen Kelley, against East Coast Greenway Alliance, Inc., The City Of New York, represented by Cocariu, Dacia C, Tomari, Anthony John, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Quiet Title) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 26, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: February 17, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 08, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 31, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation (as to Defendant East Coast Greenway Alliance) |
||
March 31, 2022 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER executed Stipulation to Further Extend Time |
||
March 02, 2022 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Executed Stipulation to Further Extend Time |
||
February 17, 2022 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT |
||
January 20, 2022 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Further Extend Time |
||
December 22, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Further Extend Time |
||
December 10, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer |
||
November 10, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation extending time to answer |
||
November 08, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer |
||
October 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.