Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Linda Pearson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Attorney Opted Out Of Efiling, Greebel, Charles Roger, against David Doe Dba First Mile Square, David Doe Dba First Mile Square, Firstgroup America Inc, First Mile Square Llc, First Mile Square Transportation Llc, (total of 14) See All represented by Moroknek, Harold L, Robinson, Jennifer A., in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Thomas Quinones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Quinones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Motor Vehicle Accident) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. The plaintiff, Linda Pearson, is suing multiple defendants, including Rosanna Perez, First Mile Square, LLC, First Mile Square Transportati...
COURT NOTICE
Date: March 28, 2024ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2024ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 11, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 06, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 19, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 04, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 19, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 16, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 18, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 10, 2023STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected*
Date: September 28, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 14, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 20, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 02, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 01, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 11, 2024 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
February 16, 2024 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
December 11, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Compliance Conference Referee Report & Order |
||
October 06, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Compliance Conference Referee Report & Order |
||
September 19, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
August 08, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 04, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 04, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 16, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Compliance Conference Referee Report & Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.