Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Marianne Arch, Scott Arch, Sherrard Arch, Susan Arch, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Alper, Edward P, against Albert Capellini, Houlihan Lawrence Inc., Mr. Inspections Inc., represented by Blake, Marcy, Weiner, Ronald Wade, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with David F Everett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid F Everett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management269 days |
Filing DateJune 24, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (During Purchase Of Home) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time440 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 04, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 19, 2016STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 19, 2016ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: July 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 15, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 09, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 30, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 01, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: March 30, 2017ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 30, 2017ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 04, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 15, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 04, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 13, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 20, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 28, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 19, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 14, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 04, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 15, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Discontinued Parris, Colette M. - Compliance Conference Part |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Parris, Colette M. - Compliance Conference Part |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 20, 2017 | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
July 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Parris, Colette M. - Compliance Conference Part Judge: Parris, Colette M. |
|
July 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Parris, Colette M. - Compliance Conference Part Judge: Parris, Colette M. |
|
July 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Parris, Colette M. - Compliance Conference Part Judge: Parris, Colette M. |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Request for Appellate Division Intervention |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* Notice of Appeal/RADI/Copy of Order/Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.