Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Houlihan Lawrence, Inc.,, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Jarashow, Mark Samuel, Lesser, Danielle Caroline, against Cary J. Downey, represented by Florence, William J, Graubard, Robert Michael, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Markus, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarkus, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1211 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: November 12, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2014ANSWER
Date: August 08, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Discontinued Trial Ready Part Judge: Trial Ready Part, |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance without Prejudice |
|
August 31, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Ready Part Judge: Trial Ready Part, |
|
June 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Ready Part Judge: Trial Ready Part, |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Advancing Trial Date |
|
April 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Ready Part Judge: Trial Ready Part, |
|
February 05, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Ready Part Judge: Trial Ready Part, |
|
November 16, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #004) Trial Ready Part Judge: Trial Ready Part, |
|
November 16, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Ready Part Judge: Trial Ready Part, |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.