Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Ceramic Tile, Rg Remodeling Inc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Benowich, Leonard A, against Arthur Avenue Italian Deli, Inc., David L. Greco, Lisa Greco, represented by De Giorgio, Michelle M, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Supreme with Damaris Torrent presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDamaris Torrent Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Enforcement Cplr 5225(B)) |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is an application by Ceramic Tile and RG Remodeling Inc., who are judgment creditors, to compel the delivery of property and payment of debt owed to the judgment debtor, Arthur Avenue Italian Deli, Inc. The complaint alleges that Ceram...
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 01, 2024JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY
Date: January 23, 2024JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Notice of Entry-Judgment | ||
January 23, 2024 | JUDGMENT - DECLARATORY | ||
July 24, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION Proposed Judgment |
||
July 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affirmation of service |
||
July 24, 2023 | Notice of Entry | ||
July 17, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip Discontinuance |
||
July 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
July 03, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation re June 21, 2023 Order |
||
June 21, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court re 6/21/23 Order |
||
June 21, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.