Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Robert T. Gold, Dds, P.C. D B A Smiles On Hudson, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Lichtenberg, David B., against Demetra Malamatenios Dds, represented by Anderson, Michael Christopher, Farrow, Sean, Nettle, Brian Eugene, Rahman, Tanvir Haque, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
COURT NOTICE
Date: September 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 15, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 05, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 01, 2023STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected*
Date: October 03, 2023STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: November 01, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 08, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 05, 2023SUMMONS
Date: March 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 22, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 12, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 12, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 25, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 09, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 |
ANSWER Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Malamatenios' Amended Counterclaims |
||
November 08, 2023 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
November 01, 2023 |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant's Amended Complaint |
||
November 01, 2023 | STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S) | ||
October 05, 2023 | Notice of Entry re Preliminary Conference Stipulation | ||
October 05, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 03, 2023 |
STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected* Preliminary Conference Stipulation |
||
September 14, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 14, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.