Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Attorney For Child, David Olk, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Kozek, Neil Edward, Lewis, Michelle Helene, O'Connor, Denise Henkel, against Sarah Driansky, represented by Most, Carol W., Paska, Christine M., in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Supreme with Amy Puerto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy Puerto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 18, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
January 15, 2024 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected* | ||
January 15, 2024 | STIPULATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
January 11, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 11, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
January 03, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 06, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
November 03, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
November 03, 2023 | STIPULATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.