Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Federal Home Loan Corporation, As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Seasoned Credit Risk Transfer Trust, Series 2020-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by May, Ted E, against Donna Garrett, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, Timothy Bleakley, represented by Unrepresented And Not Participating In Efiling, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with _ D Foreclosure Ju presiding.
Case Number |
Judge_ D Foreclosure Ju Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: November 30, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: April 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
October 03, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
August 04, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 13, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
July 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 06, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
June 02, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
April 28, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
April 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - RJI |
||
April 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OCA AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.