Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Akil Forrest, Antoinette Silva As Mother And Natural Guardian Of A.G., An Infant, Antoinette Silva Individually, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ronemus, Michael B, against H & S Property Management, Inc., Miama James, Premier Home Healthcare Services, Inc, Seven Pines Associates Limited Partnership, represented by Maxwell, Joel Michael, Risi, John A., in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts with Damaris Torrent presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDamaris Torrent Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: August 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | ORDER - CONSOLIDATION | ||
August 08, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER consolidation with Index #64252/2021 |
||
August 02, 2023 | STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION | ||
June 02, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT, WITH CROSS-CLAIMS |
||
June 02, 2023 |
ANSWER Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint |
||
June 02, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS |
||
June 02, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: ADDITIONAL COMBINED DISCOVERY DEMANDS |
||
June 02, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: INITIAL COMBINED DISCOVERY DEMANDS |
||
June 02, 2023 |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Defendants' Reply to Cross Claims of Seven Pines and H&S Property |
||
May 17, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Defendants' Combined Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.