Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lisa Formato, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Kessler, Tedd Eric, against Phelps Hospital Westchester, represented by Grant, Dawn Bristol, Oconnell, Daniel Patrick, Patterson, Gary Walter, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas Quinones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Quinones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligence) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 11, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 13, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 05, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 24, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 24, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 24, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 24, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 24, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 24, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 24, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 24, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 27, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 15, 2021STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 05, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 28, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 11, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 12, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 09, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 18, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 18, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT ADR Packet |
||
March 09, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 09, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
||
January 12, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 12, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
June 28, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Supp Response to Demand for Names and Witnesses |
||
May 27, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 24, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to D&I-Accident Reports |
||
May 24, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.