Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michael Guzman, Minerva Guzman, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Christoforo, Christina R., against Elena S. Nuthalapathy Md, Elena Vezza Md, Jane Doe, Montefiore Medical Center, Throgs Neck Rehabilitation And Nursing Center, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas Quinones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Quinones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION | ||
November 18, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Stipulation to Consolidate |
||
November 15, 2021 | STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
September 23, 2021 | NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) | ||
September 14, 2021 | NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) | ||
September 07, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE *Corrected* NMM+ Supporting Docs + AOS upon all Def. Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR NMM+ Supporting Docs + AOS upon all Def. Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 02, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order with Notice of Entry |
||
September 02, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Preliminary Conference Part |
||
September 01, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 16, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.