Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Paapa Annan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Newman, Devin Scott, Newman, James, against Jacene Thomasmills, represented by Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Anar R Patel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnar R Patel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: February 28, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 15, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 14, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Compliance Conference Report |
||
March 31, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 25, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 28, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 16, 2021 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 16, 2021 | ||
November 15, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 12, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 29, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.