Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Gunther, Tess E, against David Gonzalez, represented by Aufrecht, Mary Kathryn, Flynn, Erin K, Milchman, Brett Matthew, Weathers, Wendy Marie, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with William J Giacomo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam J Giacomo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOTE OF ISSUE |
||
May 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
May 15, 2023 |
ORDER - TRIAL READINESS Trial Readiness Referee Report & Order |
||
February 01, 2023 | STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 01, 2023 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed Preliminary Conference Stipulation |
||
January 25, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
January 12, 2023 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
||
January 12, 2023 | Affirmation | ||
January 12, 2023 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PC REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.